Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-415
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-415
Title:Carmen Electra, et al., Petitioners
v.
59 Murray Enterprises, Inc., dba New York Dolls Gentlemen's Club, et al.
Docketed:September 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-235)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2021Brief of respondents 59 Murray Enterprises, Inc., Jay-Jay Cabaret, Inc. and AAM Holding Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2021Reply of petitioners Carmen Electra, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John V. Golaszewski
    Counsel of Record
The Casas Law Firm, P.C.
1740 Broadway 15th Floor
New York, NY 10019

john@talentrights.law
646-872-3178
Party name: Carmen Electra, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David Lanier Luck
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 1110
Coral Gables, FL 33134

david.luck@lewisbrisbois.com
7867253250
Party name: 59 Murray Enterprises, Inc., Jay-Jay Cabaret, Inc. and AAM Holding Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543