Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-413
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-413
Title:Infinity Computer Products, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Oki Data Americas, Inc.
Docketed:September 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1189)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 14, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2021Waiver of right of respondent Oki Data Americas, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 27 2021Response Requested. (Due October 27, 2021)
Oct 26 2021Brief of respondent Oki Data Americas, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2021Reply of petitioner Infinity Computer Products, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8270
Party name: Infinity Computer Products, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Marc Robert Labgold
    Counsel of Record
Marc R Labgold, P.C.
12005 Sunrise Valley Drive
Suite 203
Reston, VA 20191

mlabgold@labgoldlaw.com
703-901-8860
Party name: Oki Data Americas, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543