Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-401
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-401
Title:ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Luxshare, Ltd.
Docketed:September 14, 2021
Linked with 21A80
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2736)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:July 1, 2021
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 14, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2021Brief of respondent Luxshare, Ltd. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2021Application (21A80) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 15 2021Response to application (21A80) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due Thursday, October 21, by 4 p.m.
Oct 21 2021Response to application from respondent Luxshare, Ltd. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Reply of applicants ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Application (21A80) referred to the Court.
Oct 27 2021Application (21A80) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, entered August 17, 2021, is stayed pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.
Nov 01 2021Reply of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 08 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment GRANTED. The motion of International Institute for Conflict Prevention & Resolution, Inc. for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in No. 21-518 is granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 21-518 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 10 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21-401. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21-401. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 13 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 13 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Luxshare, Ltd.
Blanket Consent
Jan 13 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley
Blanket Consent
Jan 24 2022Joint appendix filed (in 21-401). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Brief of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed (in 21-401).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Joint appendix filed (in 21-518).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Brief of petitioners AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley filed (in 21-518).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Jan 28 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, March 23, 2022. VIDED.
Jan 28 2022Brief amici curiae of Dr. Xu Guojian, Li Hongji, Zhu Yongrui, Tang Qingyang, and Dr. Zhang Guanglei filed (in 21-401).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of International Arbitration Center in Tokyo in support of neither party filed (in 21-401).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Halliburton Company filed (in 21-401).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States; Business Roundtable filed (in 21-401).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amici curiae of The International Court of Arbitration of the International Chamber of Commerce and the United States Council for International Business supporting neither party filed (in 21-401).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute of International Bankers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Yanbai Andrea Wang supporting neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, The Fund for Protection of Investors' Rights in Foreign States
Blanket Consent
Feb 04 2022Joint motion of the parties for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Feb 04 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 11 2022CIRCIULATED
Feb 23 2022Brief of respondent Luxshare, Ltd. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2022Brief of respondent The Fund for Protection of Investors' Rights in Foreign States filed (in 21-518). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2022Joint motion for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed by the parties GRANTED. VIDED.
Feb 28 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED. VIDED.
Mar 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors Tamar Meshel, Crina Baltag, Fabien Gélinas, and Janet Walker filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Ashish Virmani filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of George A. Bermann, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Federal Arbitration, Inc. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2022Reply of petitioners AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley filed (in 518). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2022Reply of petitioners ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed (in 21-401). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Argued. For petitioners in 21-401: Roman Martinez, Washington, D. C. For petitioners in 21-518: Joseph T. Baio, New York, N. Y. For United States, as amicus curiae, supporting petitioners: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent in 21-401: Andrew R. Davies, New York, N. Y. For respondent in 21-518: Alexander A. Yanos, New York, N. Y. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joseph T. Baio
    Counsel of Record
Willkie, Farr & Gallagher LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

jbaio@willkie.com
212-728-8000
Party name: AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al.
Mark Thomas StancilWillkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street
Washington, DC 20006

mstancil@willkie.com
202-303-1133
Party name: AlixPartners, LLP and Mr. Simon Freakley
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Rhys Davies
    Counsel of Record
Allen and Overy LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

andrewrhys.davies@allenovery.com
212 610 6300
Party name: Luxshare, Ltd.
Alexander Athan Yanos
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

alex.yanos@alston.com
212-210-9584
Party name: The Fund for Protection of Investors' Rights in Foreign States
Other
Lisa Wang Bohl
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
300 N. LaSalle Street, Suite 5350
Chicago, IL 60654

lbohl@mololamken.com
312-450-6710
Party name: Professors Tamar Meshel, Crina Baltag, Fabien Gélinas, and Janet Walker
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
(202) 737-0500
Party name: Halliburton Company
Jason Moberly Caruso
    Counsel of Record
Newmeyer Dillion LLP
895 Dove Street, Fifth Floor
Newport Beach, CA 92660

jason.caruso@ndlf.com
9498547000
Party name: Ashish Virmani
Derek T. Ho
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dho@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7931
Party name: Institute of International Bankers
Katherine Burghardt Kramer
    Counsel of Record
DGW Kramer LLP
One Rockefeller Plaza, Suite 1060
New York, NY 10020

kkramer@dgwllp.com
(917) 633-6860
Party name: Dr. Xu Guojian, Li Hongji, Zhu Yongrui, Tang Qingyang, and Dr. Zhang Guanglei
Linda Halliday Martin
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
601 Lexington Avenue, 31st Floor
New York, NY 10022

linda.martin@freshfields.com
+1-914-263-8625
Party name: The International Court of Arbitration of the International Chamber of Commerce and the United States Council for International Business
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3300
Party name: Professor Yanbai Andrea Wang
Jonathan B. New
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
45 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10111

jnew@bakerlaw.com
212-589-4650
Party name: George A. Bermann, Robert H. Smit, D. Brian King, Ruth Teitelbaum, And Lucas Bento
Robert Paul Parker
    Counsel of Record
Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.
607 14th Street, N.W, Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

rparker@rfem.com
202-783-6040
Party name: International Arbitration Center in Tokyo
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Peter Bowman Rutledge
    Counsel of Record
215 Morton Avenue
Athens, GA 30605

borutledge70@gmail.com
706 542 7140
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States; Business Roundtable
Henry Sabath Weisburg
    Counsel of Record
Shearman and Sterling LLP
599 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

HWeisburg@Shearman.com
212-848-4000
Party name: Federal Arbitration, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543