Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-396
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-396
Title:Delta Air Lines, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Dev Anand Oman, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15124)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 13, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2021 to November 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2021.
Nov 12 2021Brief of respondents Dev Anand Oman, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2021Reply of petitioner Delta Air Lines, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Carl Helland
    Counsel of Record
Nichols Kaster LLP
235 Montgomery Street, Suite 810
San Francisco, CA 94104

helland@nka.com
4152771239
Party name: Dev Anand Oman, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543