Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-394
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-394
Title:D. F. Pace, Petitioner
v.
Emily Baker-White, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1308)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 13, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent Emily Baker-White, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Edwin Beasley Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Beasley Firm, LLC
1125 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107

jim.beasley@beasleyfirm.com
2155921000
Party name: D.F. Pace, Esquire
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael K. Twersky
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
2000 Market Street
20th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mtwersky@foxrothschild.com
215-299-2923
Party name: Emily Baker-White, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543