Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-379
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-379
Title:Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10545)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2021.
Nov 08 2021Brief of respondents Commissioner of Internal Revenue, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 22 2021Reply of petitioners Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 06 2021Rescheduled.
Jan 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 06 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543