Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-378
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-378
Vide 21-376, 21-377, 21-380
Title:Texas, Petitioner
v.
Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al.,
Docketed:September 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-11479)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Oct 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Ohio filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Project on Fair Representation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Christian Alliance for Indian Child Welfare and ICWA Children and Families filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal respondents
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: Chad Everet Brackeen, et al.
Other
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Project on Fair Representation
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: State of Ohio
Stephen Joseph Obermeier
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

sobermeier@wiley.law
202-719-7000
Party name: Christian Alliance for Indian Child Welfare and ICWA Children and Families
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute, Texas Public Policy Foundation, Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543