Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-377
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-377
Vide 21-376, 21-378, 21-380
Title:Cherokee Nation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chad Everet Brackeen, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-11479)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2021Motion of Chad E. Brackeen, et al. to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2021Motion of Texas to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2021The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Oct 06 2021Waiver of right of respondent Navajo Nation to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Casey Family Programs, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of 180 Indian Tribes, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 8, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondents Chad E. Brackeen, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondents Texas in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Reply of petitioners Cherokee Nation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 21-376, 21-378, and 21-380 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. Parties that were plaintiffs/appellees in the lower courts shall file opening and reply briefs in conformity with Rules 33.1(g)(v) and 33.1(g)(vii), under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Parties that were defendants/appellants in the lower courts shall file briefs in conformity with Rule 33.1(g)(vi), under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2.
Feb 28 2022Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21-376. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21-376. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jul 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Navajo Nation
Blanket Consent
Aug 03 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, November 9, 2022. VIDED.
Aug 31 2022CIRCULATED
Sep 12 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 12 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Sep 13 2022The record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas has been electronically filed.
Nov 09 2022Argued. For Chad Everet Brackeen, et al.: Matthew D. McGill, Washington, D. C. For Texas: Judd E. Stone, II, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex. For federal parties: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For tribal parties: Ian H. Gershengorn, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Cherokee Nation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: Chad Everet Brackeen, et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal respondents
Paul Wesley Spruhan
    Counsel of Record
Navajo Naton Department of Justice
P.O. Box 2010
Window Rock, Navajo Nation, AZ 86515

pspruhan@nndoj.org
(928) 871-6210
Party name: Navajo Nation
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The State of Texas
Other
Erin Christine Dougherty Lynch
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
745 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 502
Anchorage, AK 99501

dougherty@narf.org
9072760680
Party name: 180 Indian Tribes and 35 Tribal Organizations
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Casey Family Programs and Ten Other Child Welfare and Adoption Organizations
Larry Stuart Jenkins
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
50 East South Temple Street, Suite 400
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

ljenkins@kmclaw.com
(801) 328-3600
Party name: Academy of Adoption and Assisted Reproduction Attorneys and National Council for Adoption
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
600 West Broadway, Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
619-738-9628
Party name: State of California
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute, Texas Public Policy Foundation, Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543