Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-364
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-364
Title:Sarada Mohapatra, Petitioner
v.
Drew Hirshfeld, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:September 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1935)
   Decision Date:February 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 22, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 13 2021Waiver of right of respondent Drew Hirshfeld to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarada Mohapatra3820 Highnob Circle
Naperville, IL 60564

630-346-6540
Party name: Sarada Mohapatra
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Drew Hirshfeld

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543