Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-357
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-357
Title:Lucille S. Taylor, Petitioner
v.
James W. Heath, President-Elect, State Bar of Michigan Board of Commissioners, et al.
Docketed:September 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2002)
   Decision Date:July 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2021 to December 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 21 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Dennis Barnes, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Sep 21 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Lucille Taylor
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Sep 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2021.
Dec 03 2021Brief of respondents Dana M. Warnez, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2021Reply of petitioner Lucille Taylor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2021Letter of December 2, 2021 regarding substitution of parties received from counsel for the respondents.
Main Document
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 29 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 04 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Derk Arend Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Mackinac Center Legal Foundation
140 W. Main Street
Midland, MI 48640

wilcox@mackinac.org
7342058601
Party name: Lucille Taylor
Attorneys for Respondents
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: James W. Heath, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543