Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-351
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-351
Title:Courtney Wild, Petitioner
v.
United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Docketed:September 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-13843)
   Decision Date:April 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2021 to November 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 3, 2021.
Oct 01 2021Brief amici curiae of National Crime Victim Law Institute and co-amici filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Brief amici curiae of Senator Dianne Feinstein, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of ECPAT-USA filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Legal Momentum filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Child USA.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 3, 2021 to January 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 4, 2022.
Jan 04 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Reply of petitioner Courtney Wild filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Child USA GRANTED.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul G. Cassell
    Counsel of Record
Utah Appellate Project - S.J. Quinney College of Law at the University of Utah
383 S. University St.
Salt Lake City, UT 84112

cassellp@law.utah.edu
8015855202
Party name: Courtney Wild
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Felicia H. Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

felicia.ellsworth@wilmerhale.com
617-526-6687
Party name: ECPAT-USA
Margaret Garvin
    Counsel of Record
National Crime Victim Law Institute
1130 SW Morrison St.
Suite 200
Portland, OR 97205

garvin@lclark.edu
5037686953
Party name: National Crime Victim Law Institute and co-amici
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 2100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3100
Party name: Senator Dianne Feinstein, et al.
James R. Marsh
    Counsel of Record
Marsh Law Firm PLlC
31 Hudson Yards
11th Floor
New York, NY 10001

jamesmarsh@marsh.law
929-232-3235
Party name: Child USA
Mary-Christine Sungaila
    Counsel of Record
Buchalter. A Professional Corporation
18400 Von Karman Avenue
Suite 800
Irvine, CA 92612

msungaila@buchalter.com
(949) 760-1121
Party name: Legal Momentum

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543