Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-350
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-350
Title:Infineum USA L.P., Petitioner
v.
Chevron Oronite Company LLC, et al.
Docketed:September 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1333)
   Decision Date:January 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Sep 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Nov 08 2021Memorandum of Federal Respondent filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2021Brief of respondent Chevron Oronite Company LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 19 2021Reply of petitioner Infineum USA L.P filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David E. De Lorenzi
    Counsel of Record
Gibbons P.C.
One Gateway Center
Newark, NJ 07102-5310

ddelorenzi@gibbonslaw.com
973 596 4500
Party name: Infineum USA L.P
Attorneys for Respondents
Naveen Modi
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

naveenmodi@paulhastings.com
202-551-1990
Party name: Chevron Oronite Company LLC
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondent Andrew Hirshfeld

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543