Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-326
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-326
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Devin Warren Sizemore
Docketed:September 1, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2018-1140)
   Decision Date:April 1, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021Letter from counsel for petitioner filed.
Main Document
Sep 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.
Oct 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Devin W. Sizemore.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief of respondent Devin W. Sizemore in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 10 2021Reply of Oklahoma not accepted for filing.(Corrected version to be submitted) (November 22, 2021)
Nov 10 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 24 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Devin W. Sizemore
Other
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543