Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-312
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-312
Title:Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ohio, ex rel. Dave Yost, Attorney General
Docketed:August 31, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2020-0092)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.
Sep 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2021Brief amici curiae of International Organization of Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Alliance for Automotive Innovation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Environmental Protection Agency, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Brief of respondent State of Ohio ex rel. Dave Yost, Ohio Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

giuffrar@sullcrom.com
212-558-3121
Party name: Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: State of Ohio ex rel. Dave Yost, Ohio Attorney General
Other
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
Gateway Plaza
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
804-775-4716
Party name: Former Environmental Protection Agency, California Air Resources Board, and Department of Justice Officials Jeffrey E. Holmstead, Ronald J. Tenpas, John D. Dunlap III, and Lynn Buhl
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736 8270
Party name: International Organization of Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, European Automobile Manufacturers’ Association, and European Association of Automotive Suppliers
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. and Motor & Equipment Manufacturers Association
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5891
Party name: Alliance for Automotive Innovation and National Automobile Dealers Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543