Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-309
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-309
Title:Southwest Airlines Co., Petitioner
v.
Latrice Saxon
Docketed:August 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3226)
   Decision Date:March 31, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Airlines for America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2021Brief of respondent Latrice Saxon in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Reply of petitioner Southwest Airlines Co. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 10 2021Petition GRANTED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jan 18 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Southwest Airlines Co.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Brief of petitioner Southwest Airlines Co. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Jan 26 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jan 28 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, March 28, 2022.
Jan 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America; National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Lyft, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Airlines for America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Uber Technologies, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Amazon.com, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2022CIRCULATED
Feb 22 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Feb 22 2022Motion for an extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Feb 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including February 24, 2022.
Feb 24 2022Brief of respondent Latrice Saxon filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2022Amicus brief of Historians not accepted for filing. (March 02, 2022)
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Historians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of National Academy of Arbitrators and National Association of Railroad Referees filed (3/10/2020). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Brief amici curiae of State of Illinois, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2022Reply of petitioner Southwest Airlines Co. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2022Argued. For petitioner: Shay Dvoretzky, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Jennifer D. Bennett, San Francisco, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Southwest Airlines Co.
Melissa Anne SiebertShook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 4700
Chicago, IL 60606

masiebert@shb.com
312-704-7700
Party name: Southwest Airlines Co.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Dale Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler, PLLC
100 Pine Street, Suite 1250
San Francisco, CA 94111

jennifer@guptawessler.com
(415) 573-0336
Party name: Latrice Saxon
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Airlines for America
James B. Coppess
    Counsel of Record
815 Sixteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jcoppess@aflcio.org
202-637-5337
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Michael L. Foreman
    Counsel of Record
Penn State Law - Civil Rights Appellate Clinic
329 Innovation Blvd., Suite 118
University Park, PA 16802

mlf25@psu.edu
814-865-3832
Party name: National Employment Lawyers Association
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: Lyft, Inc.
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Michael Edward Kenneally Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

michael.kenneally@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Amazon.com, Inc.
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law Appellate Adv
PO Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: Public Justice
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

Jane.Notz@ilag.gov
312-814-5376
Party name: State of Illinois
Sachin Sharadkumar Pandya
    Counsel of Record
University of Connecticut School of Law
65 Elizabeth Street
Hartford, CT 06105

sachin.pandya@uconn.edu
8605705169
Party name: Historians
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America; National Association of Manufacturers
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
13250 Branch View Lane
Dallas, TX 75234

gerson@texasinjurylaw.com
9722435297
Party name: American Association for Justice
Barry Marc Winograd
    Counsel of Record
Arbitrator & Mediator
875-A Island Dr., No. 144
Alameda, CA 94502

winmedarb@aol.com
(510) 273-8755
Party name: National Academy of Arbitrators and National Association of Railroad Referees

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543