Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-300
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-300
Title:In Re Joy Garner, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:August 30, 2021
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2021Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due September 29, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 29 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 29 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Health Research. (Docketed Oct. 28, 2021)(Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2021Motion of Institute for Health Research for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (October 14, 2021)(Corrected version to be submitted)
Sep 30 2021Motion of Institute for Health Research for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (October 14, 2021)(Corrected version to be submitted)
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Health Research GRANTED.
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory James Glaser
    Counsel of Record
Greg Glaser, Attorney at Law
4399 Buckboard Drive #423
Copperopolis, CA 95228

greg@gregglaser.com
9256426651
Party name: Joy Garner, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Lowell H. Becraft Jr.
    Counsel of Record
D.
403C Andrew Jackson Way
Huntsville, AL 35801

becraft@hiwaay.net
256-533-2535
Party name: Institute for Health Research

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543