Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-29
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-29
Title:Blake Leitch, et al., Petitioners
v.
American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 31, AFL-CIO
Docketed:July 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1379)
   Decision Date:February 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2021Brief of respondent American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 31, AFL-CIO in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2021Reply of petitioners Blake Leitch, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
208 South LaSalle Street, Suite 1690
Chicago, IL 60604

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Blake Leitch, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jacob Raffel Karabell
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street, N.W. Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jkarabell@bredhoff.com
2028422600
Party name: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 31, AFL-CIO

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543