Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-279
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-279
Title:Grand River Enterprises Six Nations Ltd., Petitioner
v.
Mark Boughton
Docketed:August 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1044)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2021 to November 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2021.
Nov 19 2021Brief of respondent Mark Boughton in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 24 2021Motion of Grand River Enterprises Six Nations, Ltd. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. See Rule 15.6. (November 29, 2021)
Dec 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 17 2021Reply of petitioner Grand River Enterprises Six Nations, Ltd. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kelli Jean Keegan
    Counsel of Record
Barnhouse Keegan Solimon & West LLP
7424 4th St. NW
Los Ranchos de Albuquerque, NM 87107

kkeegan@indiancountrylaw.com
5058426123
Party name: Grand River Enterprises Six Nations, Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondent
Joseph James Chambers
    Counsel of Record
Connecticut Office of the Attorney General
165 Capitol Avenue, 5th Floor
Hartford, CT 06106

joseph.chambers@ct.gov
860-808-5270
Party name: Mark Boughton

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543