Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-276
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-276
Title:Safehouse, Petitioner
v.
Department of Justice, et al.
Docketed:August 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1422)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Waiver of right of respondent U.S. Department of Justice, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Philadelphia Mayor James Kenney, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2021Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia and Ten States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2021Brief amici curiae of Fourteen Cities and Counties filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
1650 Market Street
Suite 5000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: Safehouse
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Department of Justice, et al.
Other
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia and Ten States
Jane Lovitch Istvan
    Counsel of Record
City of Philadelphia Law Department
1515 Arch Street 17th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102

jane.istvan@phila.gov
215683-5014
Party name: Philadelphia Mayor James Kenney and Acting Health Commissioner Cheryl Bettigole
Daniel Segal
    Counsel of Record
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19072

dsegal@hangley.com
215 568 6200
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, and Former Attorneys General and Department of Justice Officials and Leaders
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Fourteen Cities and Counties

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543