Docket for 21-274
|
Aug 21 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 22 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2021 to October 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 22 2021 | Letter from counsel for petitioner filed. | | Main Document | Sep 23 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2021. | | | Oct 05 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 05 2021 | Brief of respondent Johnny Edward Mize, II in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 19 2021 | Reply of petitioner State of Oklahoma filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 08 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022. | | | Jan 10 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022. | | | Jan 18 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022. | | | Jun 29 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022. | | | Jun 30 2022 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Oklahoma v. Castro-Huerta, 597 U. S. ___ (2022). | | | Aug 01 2022 | JUDGMENT ISSUED | | | Aug 01 2022 | MANDATE ISSUED | | |
|