Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-265
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-265
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Erik Sherney Williams
Docketed:August 24, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2016-937)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2021 to October 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021Letter from counsel for petitioner filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2021.
Oct 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 8, 2021.
Nov 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2021Brief of respondent Erik Sherney Williams in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 05 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Erik Sherney Williams.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Oklahoma v. Castro-Huerta, 597 U. S. ___ (2022).
Aug 01 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED
Aug 01 2022MANDATE ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Erik Sherney Williams
Other
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543