Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-259
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-259
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Arnold Dean Howell
Docketed:August 23, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(C-2017-998)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 22, 2021 to October 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 22, 2021.
Sep 22 2021Letter from counsel for petitioner filed.
Main Document
Oct 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2021Brief of respondent Arnold D. Howell in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 15 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Arnold D. Howell.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 24 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Arnold D. Howell
Other
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543