Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-249
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-249
Title:Probir Kumar Bondyopadhyay, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2091)
   Decision Date:March 11, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Probir Kumar Bondyopadhyay14418 Oak Chase Drive
Houston, TX 77062

(281) 486-7735
Party name: Probir Kumar Bondyopadhyay
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543