Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-248
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-248
Title:Philip E. Berger, et al., Petitioners
v.
North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
Docketed:August 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2273)
   Decision Date:June 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 22, 2021 to October 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 13, 2021.
Oct 13 2021Waiver of right of respondents North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP, Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 13 2021Brief of respondents Damon Circosta, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Oct 27 2021Reply of petitioners Philip E. Berger, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 24 2021Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Philip E. Berger, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ryan Young Park
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

rpark@ncdoj.gov
9197166400
Party name: Damon Circosta, Stella Anderson, Jefferson Carmon III, Stacy Eggers IV, and Wyatt T. Tucker, Sr., in their official capacities as Chair, Secretary, and members of the North Carolina State Board of Elections
Stephen Kent Wirth
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

stephen.wirth@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-6739
Party name: North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP, Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543