Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-244
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-244
Vide 21-233
Title:Taylor & Sons, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:August 18, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1185)
   Decision Date:December 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 17, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 17, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 17, 2021 to October 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2021.
Oct 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2021 to November 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 5, 2021.
Nov 05 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2021Reply of petitioners Taylor & Sons, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 13 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Roger J Marzulla
    Counsel of Record
Marzulla Law, LLC
1150 Connecticut Ave NW
Suite 1050
Washington, DC 20036

roger@marzulla.com
(202) 822-6760
Party name: Taylor & Sons, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543