Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-241
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-241
Title:Monsanto Company, Petitioner
v.
Edwin Hardeman
Docketed:August 18, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16636, 19-16708)
   Decision Date:May 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 17, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Waiver of right of respondent Edwin Hardeman to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021Letter to Clerk of Atlantic Legal Foundation not accepted for filing. (August 25, 2021 - See Rule 15.5)
Aug 25 2021Letter to the Clerk of CropLife America not accepted for filing. (August 25, 2021 - See Rule 15.5)
Aug 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of CropLife America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 01 2021Brief amici curiae of U.S. Chamber of Commerce, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Response Requested. (Due October 4, 2021)
Sep 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2021 to November 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 3, 2021.
Sep 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers for Civil Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Monsanto Company
Attorneys for Respondent
David Jackson Wool
    Counsel of Record
Andrus Wagstaff, P.C.
940 N. Lincoln St.
Denver, CO 80203

dwool@wagstafflawfirm.com
(303) 376-6360
Party name: Edwin Hardeman
Other
Alan Jay Lazarus
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker, Biddle & Reath, LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
27th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111-4180

alan.lazarus@dbr.com
(415) 591-7500
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Mary Massaron
    Counsel of Record
Plunkett & Cooney, P.C.
38505 Woodward Ave
Suite 100
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com
313-983-4801
Party name: Lawyers for Civil Justice
Jonathan S. Tam
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1 Bush St #1600
San Francisco, CA 94104

jonathan.tam@dechert.com
(646) 731-6172
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Mark Remy Yohalem
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles and Olson LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

mark.yohalem@mto.com
213-683-9188
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Shannen Wayne Coffin
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

scoffin@steptoe.com
2024296255
Party name: CropLife America
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543