Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-237
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-237
Title:James Clay, et al., Petitioners
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:August 18, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-14441)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 17, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2021Waiver of right of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert Osley Saunooke
    Counsel of Record
Saunooke Law Firm, PA
PO Box 309
Cherokee, NC 28719

ndnlawyer@hotmail.com
5613025297
Party name: James Clay, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543