Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-234
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-234
Title:Kevin R. George, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:August 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1916)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2021 to October 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2021.
Sep 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2021 to November 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 17, 2021.
Nov 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Reply of petitioner Kevin R. George filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 14 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jan 25 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Kevin R. George.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 28 2022Brief of petitioner Kevin R. George filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Amicus brief of Disabled American Veterans not accepted for filing. (March 03, 2022--Corrected version to be submitted)
Mar 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of Disabled American Veterans (3/3/2022) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy and Legal Aid Foundation of Los Angeles filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Senators Ted Cruz and Mike Lee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Swords to Plowshares and Vietnam Veterans of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, April 19, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Mar 18 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 28 2022The record received from the U.S. Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims has been electronically filed.
Mar 30 2022Brief of Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs not accepted for filing. (April 01, 2022--Corrected brief and PDF to be submitted.)
Mar 30 2022Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2022Reply of petitioner Kevin R. George filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 19 2022Argued. For petitioner: Melanie L. Bostwick, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Anthony A. Yang, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Kevin R. George
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Robert V. Chisholm
    Counsel of Record
Chisholm Chisholm & Kilpatrick
321 South Main Street
Suite 200
Providence, RI 02903

rchisholm@cck-law.com
4013316300
Party name: Disabled American Veterans
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Angela K. Drake
    Counsel of Record
Veterans Clinic University of Missouri
203 Hulston Hall
please note error on 20-1148 zip below is correct
Columbia, MO 65211-4300

drakea@missouri.edu
573-882-7630
Party name: National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy and Legal Aid Foundation of Los Angeles
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Separation of Powers Clinic, Gray Center
Antonin Scalia Law School, George Mason University
3301 Fairfax Drive
Arlington, VA 22201

rmccotte@gmu.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: Senators Ted Cruz and Mike Lee
Liam James Montgomery
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
725 12th St. NW
Washington, DC 20005

lmontgomery@wc.com
2024345030
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program; National Organization of Veterans' Advocates; Paralyzed Veterans of America; Service Women's Action Network
Amy Melissa Rose
    Counsel of Record
Swords to Plowshares
1060 Howard St
San Francisco, CA 94103

amy.rose@stp-sf.org
415-252-4788
Party name: Swords to Plowshares and Vietnam Veterans of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543