Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-233
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-233
Vide 21-244
Title:Mike Finnin Motors, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:August 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1205)
   Decision Date:December 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 17, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2021 to October 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2021.
Oct 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2021 to November 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 5, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Harry W. Zanville
    Counsel of Record
10740 El Marbea Lane
La Mesa, CA 91941

hwzlaw@gmail.com
(619) 400-7164
Party name: Mike Finnin Motors, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543