Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-220
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-220
Title:DoorDash, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Brandon Campbell
Docketed:August 16, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A159296)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 10, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2021Waiver of right of respondent Brandon Campbell to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
555 Mission Street
Suite 3000
San Francisco, CA 94105

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
4153938200
Party name: DoorDash, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Alexander R. Wheeler
    Counsel of Record
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
43364 10th Street West
Lancaster, CA 93534

alex@parris.com
6619492595
Party name: Brandon Campbell

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543