Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-210
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-210
Title:Wisconsin, Petitioner
v.
Mark D. Jensen
Docketed:August 13, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2018AP1952-CR)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Waiver of right of respondent Mark D. Jensen to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 15 2021Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2021)
Oct 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2021 to November 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2021.
Nov 09 2021Brief of respondent Mark D. Jensen in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 09 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Mark D. Jensen.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Nov 29 2021Reply of petitioner Wisconsin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Record Requested.
Dec 20 2021Record received from the Wisconsin Supreme Court and Court of Appeals (1 envelope).
Jan 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Feb 02 2022Record received from the Kenosha County Circuit Court (WI) (flash drive).
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
May 03 2022Record returned to the Kenosha County Circuit Court (WI) (flash drive).
May 03 2022Record returned to the Wisconsin Supreme Court and Court of Appeals (1 envelope).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Arthur Blimling
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
Post Office Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

blimlingja@doj.state.wi.us
608-267-3519
Party name: State of Wisconsin
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrea Taylor Cornwall
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin State Public Defender
735 North Water Street, Suite 912
Milwaukee, WI 53202

cornwalla@opd.wi.gov
414-227-4805
Party name: Mark D. Jensen

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543