Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-202
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-202
Title:Mylan Laboratories Ltd., Petitioner
v.
Janssen Pharmaceutica, N.V., et al.
Docketed:August 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1071)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2021 to October 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2021 to November 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 2, 2021, for all respondents.
Nov 02 2021Brief of respondent Andrew Hirshfeld in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 02 2021Brief of respondent Janssen Pharmaceutica NV in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Nov 16 2021Reply of petitioner Mylan Laboratories Ltd. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2021Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Thomas Smith
    Counsel of Record
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
2900 K Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20007

robert.smith1@kattenlaw.com
202-625-3616
Party name: Mylan Laboratories Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrew Hirshfeld
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Other
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Intel Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543