Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-175
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-175
Title:P. Z., Petitioner
v.
New Jersey
Docketed:August 6, 2021
Lower Ct:Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division
   Case Numbers:(A-5083-18T2)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 12, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 29 2021Response Requested. (Due October 29, 2021)
Oct 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2021 to November 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 29, 2021.
Nov 29 2021Brief of respondent New Jersey in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Louis Phillip Nappen
    Counsel of Record
Evan F. Nappen Attorney at Law, P.C.
21 Throckmorton Avenue
Eatontown, NJ 07724

louis@evannappen.com
7323898888
Party name: P. Z.
Attorneys for Respondent
Rachel Marie Conte
    Counsel of Record
Burlington County Prosecutor's Office
49 Rancocas Road
Mt. Holly, NJ 08060

rconte@co.burlington.nj.us
609-265-5772
Party name: State of New Jersey
Alexis R. AgreBurlington County Prosecutor's Office
49 Rancocas Road, P. O. Box 6000
Mount Holly, NJ 08060

aagre@co.burlington.nj.us
609-265-5035
Party name: New Jersey

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543