Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-170
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-170
Title:Rain Computing, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Samsung Electronics America, Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1646, 2020-1656)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen Y. Chow
    Counsel of Record
Hsuanyeh Law Group
11 Beacon Street
Suite 900
Boston, MA 02108

stephen.y.chow@hsuanyeh.com
6175492791
Party name: Rain Computing, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543