SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-17
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-17
Title:
David Hargreaves, Petitioner
v.
Nuverra Environmental Solutions, Inc., aka Heckmann Corporation, aka Rough Rider Escrow, Inc., et al.
Docketed:
July 8, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-3084)
Decision Date:
January 6, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
February 4, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2021
Waiver of right of respondent Nuverra Environmental Solutions, aka Heckmann Corporation, aka Rough Rider Escrow, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 28 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 02 2021
Response Requested. (Due September 1, 2021)
Aug 31 2021
Brief amici curiae of Professors of Bankruptcy Law et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2021
Brief of respondents Nuverra Environmental Solutions, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 14 2021
Reply of petitioner David Hargreaves filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 15 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron D. Van Oort
Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
2200 Wells Fargo Center
90 South 7th Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402
aaron.vanoort@faegredrinker.com
612-766-8138
Party name: David Hargreaves
Attorneys for Respondents
Ryan Ashby Shores
Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLC
401 9th Street, NW, Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004
ryan.shores@shearman.com
202 508-8058
Party name: Nuverra Environmental Solutions, aka Heckmann Corporation, aka Rough Rider Escrow, Inc., et al.
Other
Lawrence Saul Robbins
Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP
2000 K Street, NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006
lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
(202) 775-4501
Party name: Professors of Bankruptcy Law
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##