Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1607
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1607
Title:Oleg Deripaska, Petitioner
v.
Janet L. Yellen, Secretary of the Treasury, et al.
Docketed:June 29, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-5157)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 13, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2022Waiver of right of respondent Yellen, Janet, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erich Christopher Ferrari
    Counsel of Record
Ferrari & Associates
1455 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

ferrari@falawpc.com
2023295652
Party name: Oleg Deripaska
Duncan Patrick LevinFerrari & Associates, P.C.
1455 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20004

levin@ferrariassociatespc.com
2123307626
Party name: Oleg Deripaska
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Yellen, Janet, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543