Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1603
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1603
Title:Canada Hockey, L.L.C., dba Epic Sports, et al., Petitioners
v.
Texas A&M University Athletic Department, et al.
Docketed:June 29, 2022
Linked with 21A680
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-20503)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2022Application (21A680) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2022 to June 15, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 04 2022Application (21A680) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 15, 2022.
May 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2022 to August 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 19, 2022.
Aug 19 2022Brief of respondents Texas A&M University Athletic Department, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2022Reply of petitioners Canada Hockey, L.L.C., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ernest A. Young
    Counsel of Record
3208 Fox Terrace Drive.
Apex, NC 27502

young@law.duke.edu
9193607718
Party name: Canada Hockey, L.L.C., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas A&M University Athletic Department, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543