Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1601 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1601 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Areli Carbajal Escobar, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:June 28, 2022
Linked with 21A602
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-81,574-02)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 4, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 08 2022Application (21A602) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 26, 2022 to May 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 13 2022Letter to the Clerk of Areli Escobar submitted.
Main Document
Apr 20 2022Application (21A602) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 26, 2022.
May 13 2022Application (21A602) to extend further the time from May 26, 2022 to June 24, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
May 19 2022Application (21A602) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 24, 2022.
Jun 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 28, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 28, 2022 to August 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentOther
Jul 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 29, 2022.
Jul 26 2022Brief amici curiae of The Innocence Network and The Center for Integrity in Forensic Sciences, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2022Brief amici curiae of Former State Attorneys General, United States Attorneys, and Prosecutors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 29, 2022 to September 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentOther
Aug 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 28, 2022.
Sep 28 2022Brief of respondent Texas in support filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 11 2022Reply of petitioner Areli Carbajal Escobar filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 28 2022Record Requested.
Oct 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/10/2022.
Nov 09 2022Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas. The record is electronic and contains sealed materials.
Nov 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/18/2022.
Nov 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Hirotsu Woofter
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

dhwoofter@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Areli Carbajal Escobar
Attorneys for Respondent
Holly Eileen Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Travis County District Attorney's Office
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767

appellatetcda@traviscountytx.gov
(512)854-9400
Party name: Texas
Other
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Former State Attorneys General, United States Attorneys, and Prosecutors
Reginald M. Turner Jr.
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
David Jacob Zimmer
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

dzimmer@goodwinlaw.com
6175701000
Party name: The Innocence Network and The Center for Integrity in Forensic Sciences, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543