Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1567
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1567
Title:Biogen International GmbH, et al., Petitioner
v.
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Docketed:June 15, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1933)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 16, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2022 to August 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2022.
Jul 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chemistry and the Law Division of the American Chemical Society filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Nathan Kip Kelley
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 13th Street, N.W.
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

nkelley@perkinscoie.com
2026543343
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Other
James Clark Carver
    Counsel of Record
The Carver Law Firm
201 St. Charles Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

jim@thecarverlawfirm.com
(225) 636-2642
Party name: Chemistry and the Law Division of the American Chemical Society
Jeffrey P. Kushan
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jkushan@sidley.com
202-736-8914
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America; Biotechnology Innovation Organization
Daniel Bradford Winslow
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
333 Washington Street
Suite 850
Boston, MA 02108

dwinslow@newenglandlegal.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543