Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1566
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1566
Title:Juno Therapeutics, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Kite Pharma, Inc.
Docketed:June 15, 2022
Linked with 21A461
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1758)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 14, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2022Application (21A461) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 14, 2022 to June 13, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Application (21A461) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 13, 2022.
Jun 13 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2022 to August 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2022.
Jul 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of City of Hope filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Mark D. Janis and Timothy R. Holbrook filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of REGENXBIO Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Amgen Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2022Brief amici curiae of St. Jude Children’s Research Hospital, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory Andrew Castanias
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

gcastanias@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Juno Therapeutics, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Kite Pharma, Inc.
Other
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Scheffel PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mdowd@dowdscheffel.com
202-559-9175
Party name: REGENXBIO Inc.
Daralyn Jeannine Durie
    Counsel of Record
Durie Tangri LLP
217 Leidesdorff St
San Francisco, CA 94111

ddurie@durietangri.com
415-362-6666
Party name: City of Hope
Timothy R. Holbrook
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
1301 Clifton Rd, NE
Atlanta, GA 30322

tholbrook@emory.edu
404-712-0353
Party name: Mark D. Janis and Timothy R. Holbrook
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Amgen Inc., Association of University Technology Managers (AUTM), Instil Bio, Inc., Corning Incorporated, Bavarian Nordic A/S, and GlaxoSmithKline plc
Vanessa Y. Yen
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1185 Ave. of the Americas, 34th Floor
New York, NY 10036

vyen@kslaw.com
(212) 556-2100
Party name: St. Jude Children’s Research Hospital, Inc., Albert Einstein College of Medicine, the University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center, and Other Academic Research Institutions

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543