Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1557
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1557
Title:Dayonta McClinton, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 14, 2022
Linked with 21A530
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2860)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2022Application (21A530) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 12, 2022 to June 11, 2022, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 22 2022Application (21A530) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until June 11, 2022.
Jun 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Jun 30 2022Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Douglas Berman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 14 2022Response Requested. (Due August 15, 2022)
Jul 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2022Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Federal Defenders, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 15, 2022 to September 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 10 2022Amicus brief of 17 Former Federal Judges submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 14, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elie Salamon
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019-9710

elie.salamon@arnoldporter.com
2128367360
Party name: Dayonta McClinton
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Christopher D. Man
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1901 L Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

cman@winston.com
202-282-5622
Party name: 17 Former Federal Judges
Keith Bradley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP
1801 California Street, Suite 4900
Denver, CO 80202

keith.bradley@squirepb.com
303-830-1776
Party name: Professor Douglas Berman
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation et al.
Jonathan Podolsky Schneller
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers
400 S. Hope St., 18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jschneller@omm.com
213-430-8115
Party name: The National Association of Federal Defenders and FAMM
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543