Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1553
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1553
Title:Ramin Khorrami, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:June 10, 2022
Linked with 21A550
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One
   Case Numbers:(1 CA-CR 20-0088)
   Decision Date:July 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 8, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 23 2022Application (21A550) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 9, 2022 to June 8, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Mar 25 2022Application (21A550) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 8, 2022.
Jun 08 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 11, 2022 to August 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 10, 2022.
Jul 07 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Utah Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2022Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2022Reply of petitioner Ramin Khorrami filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Oct 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.
Oct 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 07 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari. Justice Gorsuch, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Ramin Khorrami
Attorneys for Respondent
Linley Sarah Wilson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

linley.wilson@azag.gov
4803293679
Party name: State of Arizona
Other
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Dallas Brent Young
    Counsel of Record
Utah County Public Defender Association
180 N. University Ave, Suite 140
Provo, UT 84601

dallasyounglegal@gmail.com
801 602-3531
Party name: Utah Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543