Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-154
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-154
Title:Nagui Mankaruse, Petitioner
v.
Raytheon Company, et al.
Docketed:August 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2309)
   Decision Date:May 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 8, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer and Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Nov 02 2021Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Rehearing DENIED. Justice Breyer and Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nagui Mankaruse19081 Carp Circle
Huntington Beach, CA 92646

(714) 840-9673
Party name: Nagui Mankaruse

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543