Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1527
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1527
Title:CustomPlay, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Amazon.com, Inc., et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2207)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jun 24 2022Waiver of right of respondent Federal Respondents to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John C. Carey
    Counsel of Record
Carey Rodriguez Greenberg & Paul LLP
1395 Brickell Avenue
Suite 700
Miami, FL 33131

jcarey@careyrodriguez.com
3053727474
Party name: CustomPlay, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543