Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1526
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1526
Title:Gilbert P. Hyatt, Petitioner
v.
United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1708)
   Decision Date:November 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 25, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2022Motion (21M123) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Apr 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2022MOTION (21M123) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022Motion (21M123) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
Jul 01 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543