Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1522
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1522
Title:Wayne Torcivia, Petitioner
v.
Suffolk County, New York, et al.
Docketed:June 3, 2022
Linked with 21A521
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4167)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 29, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2022Application (21A521) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 29, 2022 to May 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 22 2022Application (21A521) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 31, 2022.
May 31 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 5, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2022 to August 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 4, 2022, for all respondents.
Jul 01 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Justice.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Firearms Policy Coalition and FPC Action Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 05 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New Civil Liberties Alliance.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 05 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 12 2022Waiver of right of respondent Mary Catherine Smith to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 04 2022Waiver of right of respondents Diana D’Anna, Kristen Steele, and Adeeb Yacoub, M.D. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Aug 10 2022Response Requested. (Due September 9, 2022)
Aug 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2022 to October 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 11, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Wayne Torcivia
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Diana D’Anna, Kristen Steele, and Adeeb Yacoub, M.D.
Scott G. ChristesenFumuso, Kelly, Swart, Farrell,
Polin & Christesen, LLP
110 Marcus Blvd., Suite 500
Hauppauge, NY 11788-3704

schristesen@110-law.com
631-232-0200
Party name: Mary Catherine Smith
Other
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
FPC Action Foundation
5550 Painted Mirage Rd
Suite 320
Las Vegas, NV 89149

jgreenlee@fpclaw.org
(916) 517-1665
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition and FPC Action Foundation
Jeremiah Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

jmorgan@lawandfreedom.com
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Tennessee Firearms Association, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Heller Foundation, America's Future, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Brian Rosner
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC, DC 20036

BRosner1517@gmail.com
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Joshua Aaron Windham
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jwindham@ij.org
7047121490
Party name: Institute for Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543