Docket for 21-1509
 | |
|
May 24 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 15 2022 | Motion of respondents Leigh M. Champman, et al. to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 15 2022 | Motion of respondents Carol A. Carter, et al. to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 17 2022 | The motions of respondets to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including August 1, 2022, for all respondents. | | | Jul 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2022 to August 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 16, 2022, for all respondents. | | | Aug 16 2022 | Brief of respondents Pennsylvania Senator Jay Costa, Jr., et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Aug 16 2022 | Brief of respondents Leigh M. Chapman, Jessica Mathis, Tom Wolf in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 16 2022 | Brief of respondents Carter Respondents in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Aug 16 2022 | Letter of Philip T. Gressman, et al. submitted. | | Main Document | Aug 31 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. | | | Sep 26 2022 | Reply of petitioner Ryan Costello filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|