Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1505
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1505
Title:Mark H. Bonner, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:June 1, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1817)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 1, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Waiver of right of respondent McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs,, Denis to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Healy Bonner
    Counsel of Record
5840 Bromelia Court
Naples, FL 34119

mbonner@avemarialaw.edu
(239) 687-5394
Party name: Mark H. Bonner
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs,, Denis

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543