Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1503
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1503
Title:Lloyds Banking Group plc, et al., Petitioners
v.
The Berkshire Bank, et al.
Docketed:June 1, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1987)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Waiver of right of respondent The Berkshire Bank, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Jul 06 2022Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2022)
Jul 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2022 to September 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 1, 2022.
Aug 23 2022Brief of respondents The Berkshire Bank, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 07 2022Reply of petitioners Lloyds Banking Group plc, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice, Justice Kagan, and Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul Alessio Mezzina
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding, LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006

pmezzina@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc (n/k/a NatWest Group plc)
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
    Counsel of Record
Pomerantz LLP
600 Third Avenue, Floor 20
New York, NY 10016

jalieberman@pomlaw.com
212-661-1100
Party name: The Berkshire Bank, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543