Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1495
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1495
Title:Jimmy Baldea, Petitioner
v.
City of New York License Division of the NYPD
Docketed:May 31, 2022
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, First Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(2021-02170)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 10, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Aug 01 2022Response Requested. (Due August 31, 2022)
Aug 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2022 to October 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2022.
Sep 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2022 to October 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 31, 2022.
Oct 31 2022Brief of respondent City of New York License Division of the NYPD in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2022Reply of petitioner Jimmy Baldea filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022.
Dec 05 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jimmy Baldea2905 160th Street
Flushing, NY 11358

(212) 300-5126
Party name: Jimmy Baldea
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York State Office of the Attorney General
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: City of New York License Division of the NYPD
Tahirih M. SadriehCorporation Counsel of the City of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

tsadrieh@law.nyc.gov
(212) 356-3191
Party name: City of New York License Division of the NYPD

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543